Financial history KEBLE COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1143997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £11.51m £38.35m £12.50m £16.40m £13.02m
Total expenditure £11.40m £11.19m £11.52m £14.54m £14.44m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.99m £1.98m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.09m £29.93m £2.50m £4.91m £1.87m
Income - Other trading activities £2.17m £1.95m £1.81m £1.72m £1.14m
Income - Charitable activities £6.01m £6.59m £6.46m £8.04m £7.13m
Income - Endowments £224.00k £1.50m £1.81m £2.10m £1.70m
Income - Investment £1.34m £1.27m £1.61m £1.62m £2.38m
Income - Other £116.00k £112.00k £120.00k £118.00k £493.00k
Income - Legacies £199.00k £384 £57.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.51m £9.21m £9.38m £12.35m £12.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.89m £1.98m £834.00k £697.00k £707.00k
Expenditure - Governance £20.00k £21.00k £24.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.31m £1.50m £1.40m