TYNEMOUTH UNITED FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charities activity has been to promote the community participation in healthy recreation by the provision of the facilities for the playing of football. For 2012/13 we had 15 teams from the age of Under 8 to Under 18. This allowed for over 200 young people to enjoy football in a safe and organised environment. We were able to win our first ever trophy the NEYDL Knockout Cup.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 11 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN HENDERSON | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE PARVIN | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL CHANDLER B.SOC SC | Trustee | 16 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DOUG LEITCH | Trustee | 16 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.23k | £41.04k | £39.22k | £50.37k | £58.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.38k | £35.86k | £46.33k | £54.69k | £56.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 08/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH TYNESIDE AND SURROUNDING AREAS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 North Ridge
Whitley Bay
NE25 9XT
- Phone:
- 01912518641
- Website:
-
WWW.TYNEMOUTHUNITEDFC.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window