ASHRAYA NEPAL-UK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1144306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 21/06/2016 21/06/2017 21/06/2018 21/06/2019 21/06/2020
Total gross income £7.91k £5.01k £2.44k £2.53k £2.10k
Total expenditure £8.11k £5.27k £2.42k £2.00k £1.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A