Accounts and annual returns LOS PENTECOSTALES DE LONDRES

Charity number: 1143723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window