Financial history LOS PENTECOSTALES DE LONDRES

Charity number: 1143723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £46.08k £39.55k £59.27k £62.61k £68.18k
Total expenditure £45.61k £43.59k £49.53k £56.96k £48.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A