Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST KATHARINES, BLACKROD

Charity number: 1144084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Angela Wynne Chair 13 October 2016
None on record
Jacqueline Sorry Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Kath Ashton Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Marlene Atherton Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Jane Kenyon Trustee 25 January 2023
None on record
Rev Carol McCabe Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Deborah Howard Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Diane Cashmore Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Brian McCabe Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Hazel Lord Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Sheila Kinrade Trustee 25 May 2020
None on record
CHRISTOPHER SKINNER Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Margaret Sumner Trustee 11 April 2019
None on record
Helen Gambles Trustee 11 April 2019
None on record
Susan Margaret Parry Trustee 11 April 2019
None on record
Mary Pryle Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
ROBERT JAMES CHAPMAN Trustee 11 July 2012
None on record
JANET Hollick Trustee 11 July 2012
None on record
JEAN MARGARET HIBBERT Trustee 30 September 2011
None on record