Trustees BUCKHURST PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1144530
Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bhim Bahadur Pun Chair 08 December 2018
None on record
Fanxeil Fernandes Trustee 26 July 2023
None on record
Haribahadur Limbu Trustee 14 June 2021
None on record
Francis Goes Trustee 08 December 2018
None on record
Lal Bahadur Shrees Trustee 08 December 2018
None on record
Gyan Gurung Trustee 08 December 2018
None on record
Ranjan Malla Trustee 08 December 2018
None on record
Roy Stephen Trustee 07 July 2013
None on record
Mohan Thapa Trustee 24 June 2013
None on record
STEVE ALLSOPP Trustee 25 January 2013
None on record