THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST. DUNSTAN'S, CRANBROOK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St. Dunstan's, the parish church of Cranbrook, seeks to serve the Mission of God in the town and surrounding area The Mission of St Dunstan's St. Dunstan's exists for the glory of God and as a sign of God's Kingdom in the world. This Mission is expressed through being: A Welcoming Church An Outreaching Church A Caring Church A Worshipping Church A Growing Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 24 October 2011: Previously excepted registration
- ST. DUNSTAN'S PCC, CRANBROOK (Working name)
- THE PAROCIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST. DUNSTAN'S, CRANBROOK (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John Acourt Tapper | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Day | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Michael Day | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard King | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Janette Isobel Lloyd | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Mary Hooper | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Valerie Ann Piper | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hancock | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Celia Quarrington | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Gasson | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher Robin Stead | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Alun Aneuryn Jones | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226.98k | £156.92k | £125.49k | £149.40k | £108.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.94k | £197.28k | £108.81k | £135.50k | £118.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 February 2022 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 February 2022 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 December 2020 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 December 2020 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST DUNSTAN'S CHURCH OFFICE
Church House
Stone Street
CRANBROOK
TN17 3HA
- Phone:
- 01580 715861
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window