ST MARY'S ARTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Mary's church has functioned both as a place of worship and a community arts venue, hosting performances and exhibitions from local and international artists.With funds from Ashford Borough Council, Arts Council England and Kent CC, St Mary's Arts Trust is operating a centre of excellence for the arts where the community can come together and experience high quality performance and exhibitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £77,888 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 06 December 2011: Standard registration
- St Mary's Arts Trust T/A Revelation (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH CHARLES BLANSHARD | Chair | 06 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Bernard Heyes | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Guy Bushnell | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roberta Spicer | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Linda Wraxall | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE BURGE | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.71k | £147.81k | £175.91k | £219.58k | £149.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.16k | £102.84k | £179.97k | £247.47k | £161.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £90.13k | £124.78k | £91.70k | £109.23k | £77.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 SEP 2011 as amended on 12 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE ARTS OF DRAMA, BALLET, MUSIC, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR A PROGRAM OF ARTS PRIMARILY AT THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, ASHFORD, KENT OR OTHER SUITABLE VENUES IN ASHFORD, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND VISITORS TO THE BOROUGH OF ASHFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Revelation
First Floor Offices
18 North Street
Ashford
TN24 8JR
- Phone:
- 01233663201
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window