Financial history PLYMOUTH SPORTS CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1146141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £148.46k £141.44k £346.62k £120.12k £120.12k
Total expenditure £166.53k £146.08k £133.63k £189.98k £189.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £52.00k £1.59k