SUFFOLK WEST CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1144118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Porch Trustee 25 October 2016 None on record
CHRISTOPHER ALEC CADMAN Trustee 03 October 2011 None on record
Marc Walker Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Vivienne Steele Trustee 05 April 2017 None on record
Judith Hall Trustee 05 April 2017 None on record
Michael Simpkin Trustee 31 March 2014 None on record
Raymond David Bolton Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Jane Wilkie Trustee 09 July 2021 None on record
James Keith Lardner Trustee 19 February 2019 None on record
Peter Holland Trustee 28 April 2014 None on record