Accounts and annual returns ALL SAINTS NORMANTON COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1143947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window