Financial history ALL SAINTS NORMANTON COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1143947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £44.84k £44.73k £51.84k £143.29k £85.40k
Total expenditure £42.49k £48.94k £40.05k £47.79k £141.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £11.02k £31.88k £52.60k £33.40k