Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEDMINSTER

Charity number: 1145503
Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 184 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 184 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 April 2022 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 April 2022 246 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window