Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEDMINSTER

Charity number: 1145503
Charity reporting is overdue by 186 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £139.54k £282.83k £355.55k £210.92k £123.00k
Total expenditure £153.96k £145.84k £369.13k £212.33k £153.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A