Accounts and annual returns SKY BADGER

Charity number: 1144234
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 March 2023 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 March 2023 58 days late
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On time
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 July 2020 On time
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time