PENSILVA HEALTH AND FITNESS ASSOCIATION LTD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate as All Being Well and we are a village gym which has members with a wide range of abilities and ages ranging from teens to upper eighties. We also welcome abilities from serious training to fighting middle-age spread to maintaining mobility in elderly limbs. We are equipped to assist disabled people including those in wheelchairs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 31 May 2013: Standard registration
- ALL BEING WELL (Working name)
- PENSILVA HEALTH AND FITNESS CO-OPERATIVE LTD. (Previous name)
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR B DWELLY | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|||||
MR R. PEARCE | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR J BICARREGUI | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.35k | £21.51k | £23.47k | £6.13k | £7.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.02k | £14.68k | £9.48k | £7.81k | £9.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £16.49k | £18.94k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/03/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AND TO IMPROVE THE HEALTH OF THE COMMUNITY IN PENSILVA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY PROVIDING AND MANAGING A FITNESS SUITE, AND ANY OTHER APPROPRIATE ACTIVITIES, AND INCLUDING PROVISION FOR THE NEEDS OF THOSE WITH DISABILITIES AND THOSE AT ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Millennium House
Princess Road
Pensilva
Liskeard
PL14 5NF
- Phone:
- 01579363890
- Email:
- abwgym@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window