MANE CHANCE SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1144144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £302.75k £329.89k £376.76k £321.96k £287.75k
Total expenditure £287.85k £283.88k £293.13k £380.21k £334.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A