MANE CHANCE SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1144144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Stuckey Trustee 25 February 2021 None on record
Dr Sue Tresman Trustee 06 October 2016 None on record
Nathaniel Potts Trustee 30 July 2020 None on record
Shabira Papain Trustee 30 July 2020 None on record
Sarah Webb Trustee 18 January 2018 None on record
James McCarthy Trustee 18 January 2018
LUCY AIR AMBULANCE FOR CHILDREN CHARITY Received: On time
Hannah Richardson Chair 25 February 2021 None on record
JENNY SEAGROVE Trustee 05 October 2011
THE BORN FREE FOUNDATION Received: On time