OUR LADY AND ST GERARDS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1144360
Charity reporting is overdue by 1698 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 603 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 603 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 968 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 968 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1333 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1333 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1698 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1698 days