CHANGES HEALTH & WELLBEING

Charity number: 1144940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.81m £1.64m £1.31m £1.26m £1.45m
Total expenditure £1.83m £1.65m £1.32m £1.36m £1.49m
Income from government contracts £1.70m £1.51m £1.10m £1.11m £1.26m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.54k £3.99k £2.32k £2.20k £4.32k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.76m £1.59m £1.28m £1.14m £1.40m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £177 £108 £1 £0 £3
Income - Other £43.04k £51.71k £22.33k £11.64k £45.27k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.79m £1.61m £1.27m £1.33m £1.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £41.71k £43.97k £42.64k £33.45k £27.57k
Expenditure - Governance £9.85k £7.83k £6.63k £0 £6.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £11.11k £351 £0