CHANGES HEALTH & WELLBEING

Charity number: 1144940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Mark Unwin Trustee 27 November 2019
VISIONS TRUST Received: On time
ERNEST JOHN IRONS Trustee 04 October 2011 None on record
Jennifer Manchester Trustee 27 November 2019 None on record
Jonathan Aaron Ball Trustee 27 November 2019 None on record
Mr D Tunstall Trustee 11 November 2015 None on record
Christopher John Wilton Trustee 18 November 2020 None on record
CLAIR DAVIS Trustee 06 December 2011 None on record
Amanda Elizabeth Howell Trustee 23 August 1967 None on record
Alison Ratcliffe Trustee 03 August 2017 None on record
Samantha Heywood-Cox Trustee 18 November 2020 None on record
Desmond Wootton Trustee 03 August 2017 None on record
Stephen Sharrock Trustee 27 November 2019 None on record
Catherine Roberts Trustee 23 October 2013
RUBYGIRL LIMITED Received: On time