Accounts and annual returns ST MARGARET'S COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1145008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window