Financial history ST MARGARET'S COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1145008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £60.79k £74.00k £58.20k £83.27k £87.17k
Total expenditure £43.19k £66.00k £60.33k £67.21k £76.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £200 £200 £13.77k