Trustees ST MARGARET'S COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1145008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Ball Trustee 28 June 2021
None on record
Tanya Ann Wightman Trustee 07 February 2020
None on record
Julia Maria Maciel Goode Trustee 19 February 2019
None on record
Timothy Price Trustee 18 February 2019
None on record
HANS MUNDRY Trustee 10 May 2017
BOTELER EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
Karen Mundry Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record
DIDA MARIA MACIEL GOODE Trustee 25 November 2011
WARRINGTON COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
Received: On time