Accounts and annual returns PALOP-(PORTUGUESE SPEAKING COMMUNITIES ASSOCIATION)

Charity number: 1144773
Charity reporting is overdue by 168 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 168 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 168 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 April 2021 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 April 2021 437 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required