Accounts and annual returns DUNSTABLE & HOUGHTON REGIS STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1144472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 27 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 10 February 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 31 December 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required