Financial history DUNSTABLE & HOUGHTON REGIS STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1144472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £11.61k £7.31k £4.43k £2.06k £1.40k
Total expenditure £11.85k £4.58k £3.42k £2.94k £2.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A