ACTIVATED CITIZENS

Charity number: 1145568
Charity reporting is overdue by 1592 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 131 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 131 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 496 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 496 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 862 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 862 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1227 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1227 days
Annual return 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1592 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1592 days