FREE 2 BE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO EMPOWER AND INSPIRE PEOPLE TO BELIEVE THEY CAN BE ALL THEY WERE CREATED TO BE. PROVIDING BUSINESS TRAINING AND MICRO-FINANCE TO POOR & DISADVANTAGED KENYANS. PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL EQUIPMENT FOR SCHOOLS, UNIFORMS AND CLASSROOMS FOR AIDS ORPHANS, WATER HARVESTING AND OTHER SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF LIVING. BELIEVING A HAND-UP ENABLES AND BRINGS INDEPENDENCE BUT HAND-OUTS DISABLE AND CAUSE DEPENDENCE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Akrotiri
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antarctica
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jersey
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Mariana Islands
- North Korea
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Saudi Arabia
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wallis And Futuna
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 12 December 2011: Standard registration
- 06 December 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FREE 2 BE (Working name)
- FREE 2 BE MINISTRIES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 15 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/02/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT GOOD NEWS CHILDREN CENTRE SCHOOL, WEBUYE AND MAKATANO CHURCH SCHOOL (BUT NOT LIMITED TO THESE SCHOOLS) AND TO PROVIDE FREE EDUCATION FOR ORPHANS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, BY MEANS OF CHRISTIAN TEACHINGS, CONFERENCES, OUTDOOR MEETINGS, CHURCH SERVICES, GIVING MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC NATURE AND BY SHOWING GOD'S LOVE IN ACTION TO THE LOCAL PEOPLE IN KENYA OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AS DECIDED BY THE TRUSTEES. 3. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN WESTERN KENYA (INITIALLY) BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES. 4. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT AND ASSISTING THEM TO START UP A BUSINESS. 5. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE HEALTH FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN WEBUYE AND BUNGOMA, KENYA WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS. 6. TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window