SOUTH YORKSHIRE REFUGEE LAW AND JUSTICE

Charity number: 1146748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required