SOUTH YORKSHIRE REFUGEE LAW AND JUSTICE

Charity number: 1146748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.14k £6.28k £26.38k £75.66k £70.64k
Total expenditure £12.56k £16.24k £16.51k £37.07k £66.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A