Accounts and annual returns WYCOMBE TAMIL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1147539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 July 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 13 July 2021 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 June 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 11 June 2020 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 August 2019 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 August 2019 91 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window