The Literacy Pirates Limited

Charity number: 1145115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin John Halford Trustee 03 July 2017 None on record
Dr Jason Atta Kwei Arday Trustee 17 October 2019 None on record
Katherine Helen Elizabeth Fennell Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Nicholas Anthony Canning Chair 01 April 2019 None on record
Alon Avner Trustee 15 January 2020 None on record
Erin Elizabeth Northey Trustee 03 July 2017 None on record
Aisha Ajoke Miller-Dyer Trustee 01 November 2021 None on record
JAMES PATRICK WESTHEAD Trustee 18 January 2018
TEACH FOR ALL NETWORK Received: On time