Financial history ORPHANS IN NEED

Charity number: 1144812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £7.05m £11.59m £10.38m £12.79m £16.00m
Total expenditure £5.71m £11.59m £10.97m £9.87m £14.57m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.04m £11.58m £10.35m £12.74m £15.96m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £29.24k £33.38k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.01k £14.93k £27.49k £18.94k £10.83k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £18
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.60m £10.15m £9.57m £8.36m £12.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.11m £1.21m £1.40m £1.33m £1.73m
Expenditure - Governance £75.86k £80.03k £52.85k £48.31k £34.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.70m £9.38m £8.83m £7.57m £11.87m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £238.47k £0 £173.37k £24.15k