Financial history FRIENDS OF PERSHORE HOSPITAL

Charity number: 502273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.59k £140.02k £33.66k £56.70k £83.48k
Total expenditure £28.06k £59.57k £61.06k £30.94k £38.42k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A