Dogfen lywodraethu MIDLAND RAILWAY TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 FEBRUARY 1973 AS AMENDED 5 NOVEMBER 1976 AND 11 JULY 1997. as amended on 20 Jul 2018 as amended on 06 Sep 2019 as amended on 06 Sep 2019 as amended on 06 Sep 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To advance the knowledge and understanding of the role played by the Midland Railway Company and its successors in technological and social development, both regionally and nationally, together with its links with communities and industry, for the benefit of the public, by the establishment and maintenance of a working museum and associated estate. "Midland Railway Company and its successors" means the Midland Railway Company and its constituent companies, the London Midland and Scottish Railway and its constituent companies, British Railways Midland Region, subsequent companies operating trains on former Midland Railway lines and the continuing tradition of train building in Derby and Derbyshire;
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.