BARNET BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1144512
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 March 2020 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 June 2018 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 June 2018 494 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required