BIG CHANGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1145224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 October 2017 On time Download