Financial history BIG CHANGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1145224
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.54m £3.66m £2.24m £1.20m £2.18m
Total expenditure £1.17m £2.77m £1.97m £1.73m £2.06m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.36m £2.53m £1.87m £1.03m £1.53m
Income - Other trading activities £180.71k £1.13m £363.39k £0 £601.75k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £5.04k £11.30k £8.80k £28.76k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £162.57k £20.96k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £809.16k £1.53m £1.33m £1.48m £1.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £357.20k £246.00k £636.46k £246.63k £173.28k
Expenditure - Governance £34.24k £0 £72.70k £77.95k £69.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £333.21k £879.08k £461.33k £693.81k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £12.22k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £989.37k £0 £3.08k £514.26k