Accounts and annual returns THE RHEMA PENTECOSTAL CHURCH -UK

Charity number: 1146816
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window