Financial history THE RHEMA PENTECOSTAL CHURCH -UK

Charity number: 1146816
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £154.47k £194.25k £255.67k £316.20k £300.65k
Total expenditure £155.73k £194.90k £252.71k £310.39k £319.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A