THE PAKISTAN HEALTH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our initial project is to acquire land in Charsada, Pakistan, the area affected by the floods in 2010, and construct a basic health unit on it, to serve 200,000 local people without access previously to healthcare. We will then constuct a complete hospital, including a maternity unit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Pakistan
Governance
- 18 January 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ghazala Chapman | Chair | 18 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Syed Jahanzeb Naqvi | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221 | £161 | £320 | £0 | £45 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £30 | £375 | £0 | £1 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 April 2021 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/09/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/01/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC IN PAKISTAN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROVISION, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION, OF MEDICAL CENTRES, HEALTHCARE FACILITIES, MEDICINE, SANITATION AND CLEAN WATER SUPPLIES; B) WORKING WITH PARTNERS TO DEVELOP AND ADVANCE THE PROVISION OF SAID FACILITIES; AND C) ADVANCING OPPORTUNITIES AND TRAINING FOR FEMALE DOCTORS AND OTHER HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broadoaks
Cann Lane North
Appleton
WARRINGTON
England
WA4 5NF
- Phone:
- 07917652549
- Email:
- GHAZALACHAPMAN@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window