Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HIGH ONGAR

Charity number: 1145367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janine Annn Thirkettle Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Wendy Ann Pike Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Peter John Garner Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
Fiona Baxter Trustee 12 March 2018
THE WALTHAM ABBEY ROYAL GUNPOWDER MILLS COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
Christine Alderman Trustee 12 March 2018
None on record
Katherine Garner Trustee 13 November 2017
None on record
Joanna Saward Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
Keeley Clair Wilkinson Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
BENJAMIN KIRKBY PEACE Trustee 19 July 2013
None on record
DEREK GRAHAM SMITH Trustee 10 January 2012
None on record