ACTION FOR A-T

Charity number: 1145303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 August 2017 On time Download