ACTION FOR A-T

Charity number: 1145303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £626.78k £648.39k £824.50k £768.82k £458.65k
Total expenditure £787.91k £848.33k £365.53k £910.84k £839.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £48.21k
Income - Donations and legacies £208.63k £163.36k £353.44k £359.83k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £414.53k £481.23k £461.98k £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £394.89k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £616 £537 £6.09k £11.11k N/A
Income - Other £3.00k £3.27k £3.00k £3.00k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £568.69k £593.41k £144.34k £691.56k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £206.44k £241.07k £221.19k £219.28k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £12.78k £13.86k £22.59k £17.58k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £540.62k £549.37k £0 £598.03k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £13.86k £0 £0 N/A