Accounts and annual returns Kashmir Pearl Foundation

Charity number: 1147528
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 92 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 March 2022 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 March 2022 509 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 January 2020 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required