Financial history Kashmir Pearl Foundation

Charity number: 1147528
Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £3.00k £1.09k £60 £266
Total expenditure £0 £2.19k £807 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A