TATA STEEL CRICKET CLUB

Charity number: 1145644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £22.12k £23.07k £19.83k £17.42k £19.60k
Total expenditure £16.32k £23.05k £20.62k £16.60k £19.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £3.00k £2.72k N/A N/A