TATA STEEL CRICKET CLUB

Charity number: 1145644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Douglas Jardine Trustee 27 November 2019 None on record
Daniel Giuseppe Melindo Trustee 17 November 2019 None on record
Kelvin Bartle Trustee 17 November 2016 None on record
David John Arthur Jones Trustee 14 April 2021 None on record
PAUL DONOVAN Trustee 22 October 2011 None on record
John Williams Trustee 17 November 2017 None on record
NATHAN FERRELL Trustee 26 January 2012 None on record
Christopher Sean Holley Trustee 05 July 2021 None on record
Richard Jones Trustee 26 January 2012 None on record
Matthew David Jones Trustee 17 November 2016 None on record
Rohan Edward Herbert Trustee 17 November 2016 None on record
Matthew George Saker Trustee 17 November 2020 None on record
Damien John Williams Trustee 17 November 2019 None on record
PETER GRAHAM DOYLE Trustee 26 January 2012 None on record
MARK DONOVAN Trustee 26 January 2012 None on record